IN SB0489 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Public Law 34
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Public Law 34
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State board of accounts issues. Provides that the state board of accounts has access to any periodic statement of condition filed by a depository with the treasurer of state. Provides that a vendor upon request shall allow the state board of accounts to access all software and records of computer services that a vendor has supplied to a political subdivision. Defines a vendor as a person who supplies electronic goods, software, or technological services (including computer services) to a political subdivision.
Title
State board of accounts issues. Provides that the state board of accounts has access to any periodic statement of condition filed by a depository with the treasurer of state. Provides that a vendor upon request shall allow the state board of accounts to access all software and records of computer services that a vendor has supplied to a political subdivision. Defines a vendor as a person who supplies electronic goods, software, or technological services (including computer services) to a political subdivision.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Randall Head [R] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Rep. Philip GiaQuinta [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Concur in House Amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-17 | Senate | Public Law 34 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 365: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2015-03-19 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2015-03-19 | House | Representative GiaQuinta added as cosponsor |
2015-03-19 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 302: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2015-03-17 | House | Representative Koch added as cosponsor |
2015-03-17 | House | Amendment #2 (Lehman) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-03-17 | House | Amendment #1 (Lehman) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-03-17 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-03-10 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-05 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Representative Lehman added as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 259: yeas 48, nays 2 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as coauthor |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senator Head added as second author |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Young R Michael) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Young R Michael |