IN SB0487 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 15 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - House advisors appointed: Ubelhor, Eberhart, Dvorak and Stemler
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 15 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - House advisors appointed: Ubelhor, Eberhart, Dvorak and Stemler
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Shooting and hunting preserves.
Title
Shooting and hunting preserves.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-15 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 52 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-18 | House | House advisors appointed: Ubelhor, Eberhart, Dvorak and Stemler |
2013-04-18 | House | House conferees appointed: Lehe and Kersey |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as coauthor |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate advisor appointed: Waterman and Hume |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate conferee appointed: Steele and R. Young |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2013-04-15 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2013-04-15 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 495: yeas 52, nays 39 |
2013-04-08 | House | Amendment 1 (Eberhart), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-08 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-04-04 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-04-02 | House | Representatives Morris and Heaton added as cosponsors |
2013-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Cosponsor: Rep. Ubelhor |
2013-02-14 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Lehe |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 129: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senator R. Young added as coauthor |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment 1 (Steele), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senator Waterman added as second author |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Steele |