IN SB0485 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 230
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Building standards. Removes language that relates to the temporary rules and regulation of sanitary conditions and sanitary facilities of Class I structures. Adds certain elevator standards to the list of national codes, or their equivalent, that the fire prevention and building safety commission (commission) shall adopt to comply with the statewide code of fire and safety building laws. Removes the requirement that the commission shall adopt the most recent edition, including addenda, of ASME A17.3 (Safety Code for Existing Elevators and Escalators, an American National Standard). Allows the department of homeland security (department) to request certain types of documentation to determine that work conducted on a regulated lifting device was performed by a licensed individual. Requires the commission to adopt national codes within 24 months after the effective date of the national code. Provides that the commission may not adopt an amendment to a national code if the amendment will unreasonably impair safety. Allows the commission to set a fee that is less than the standard fee for certain permits if the acceptance inspection is performed by an inspector that is not employed by the department. Requires an individual who is renewing an operating certificate to submit all safety test results when making application for the renewal operating certificate. Removes obsolete sections. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Building standards. Removes language that relates to the temporary rules and regulation of sanitary conditions and sanitary facilities of Class I structures. Adds certain elevator standards to the list of national codes, or their equivalent, that the fire prevention and building safety commission (commission) shall adopt to comply with the statewide code of fire and safety building laws. Removes the requirement that the commission shall adopt the most recent edition, including addenda, of ASME A17.3 (Safety Code for Existing Elevators and Escalators, an American National Standard). Allows the department of homeland security (department) to request certain types of documentation to determine that work conducted on a regulated lifting device was performed by a licensed individual. Requires the commission to adopt national codes within 24 months after the effective date of the national code. Provides that the commission may not adopt an amendment to a national code if the amendment will unreasonably impair safety. Allows the commission to set a fee that is less than the standard fee for certain permits if the acceptance inspection is performed by an inspector that is not employed by the department. Requires an individual who is renewing an operating certificate to submit all safety test results when making application for the renewal operating certificate. Removes obsolete sections. Makes conforming changes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-05SenatePublic Law 230
2019-05-05SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-18SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 534: yeas 46, nays 0
2019-04-17SenateMotion to concur filed
2019-04-11HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-04-09HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 440: yeas 90, nays 4
2019-04-08HouseAmendment #1 (Frye R) ruled out of order
2019-04-08HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-04-04HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-18HouseRepresentative Klinker added as cosponsor
2019-03-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2019-02-20SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-18SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Gutwein
2019-02-18SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 144: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-02-14SenateSenator Bohacek added as second author
2019-02-14SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-12SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Alting

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/485/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/0/f/8f0f8ed7/SB0485.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/0/e/e/70eeff17/SB0485.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/d/3/2bd34874/SB0485.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/f/3/f/cf3f5b8f/SB0485.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/6/e/8e6e13f3/SB0485.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/d/1/7/0d177a68/SB0485.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/f/e/7/4fe7aa5e/SB0485.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/e/a/0/7ea031d6/SB0485.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/1/2/b3121dfe/SB0485.144.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/b/b/bcbbacaf/SB0485.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/c/1/44c18555/SB0485.440.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/5/a/2b5ac772/SB0485.534.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback