IN SB0481 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Stormwater drain maintenance. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate study committee the topic of the maintenance of stormwater drains in subdivisions not located within a municipality. Provides that if the topic is assigned to a committee, the committee shall issue a final report, including any recommendations for legislation, to the legislative council not later than November 1, 2015.
Title
Stormwater drain maintenance. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate study committee the topic of the maintenance of stormwater drains in subdivisions not located within a municipality. Provides that if the topic is assigned to a committee, the committee shall issue a final report, including any recommendations for legislation, to the legislative council not later than November 1, 2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Utilities - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Utilities - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Representative Cherry added as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 257: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as second author |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Utilities |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Buck |