IN SB0480 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Public Law 116
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Medicaid nonemergency medical transport. Sets forth requirements for brokers of nonemergency medical transportation under the Medicaid fee-for-service program. Establishes the nonemergency medical transportation commission (commission) and sets forth duties of the commission. Requires the office of the secretary of family and social services to prepare before October 1, 2019, a report concerning nonemergency medical transportation Medicaid claims and submit the report to the commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid nonemergency medical transport. Sets forth requirements for brokers of nonemergency medical transportation under the Medicaid fee-for-service program. Establishes the nonemergency medical transportation commission (commission) and sets forth duties of the commission. Requires the office of the secretary of family and social services to prepare before October 1, 2019, a report concerning nonemergency medical transportation Medicaid claims and submit the report to the commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenatePublic Law 116
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-24HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-16SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 511: yeas 47, nays 0
2019-04-09SenateMotion to concur filed
2019-04-09HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-04-08HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 422: yeas 96, nays 0
2019-04-04HouseAmendment #1 (Pressel) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-04HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-03-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-26HouseRepresentative Hatfield added as cosponsor
2019-03-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2019-02-11SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-07SenateSenator Buck added as coauthor
2019-02-07SenateCosponsors: Representatives Karickhoff and Bacon
2019-02-07SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Pressel
2019-02-07SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 93: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-02-05SenateAmendment #2 (Breaux) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-05SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-02-04SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-02-04SenateSenators Breaux and Melton added as coauthors
2019-01-31SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-15SenateSenator Tomes added as coauthor
2019-01-15SenateSenator Charbonneau added as third author
2019-01-15SenateSenator Tomes removed as third author
2019-01-14SenateSenator Merritt added as coauthor
2019-01-14SenateSenator Leising added as coauthor
2019-01-14SenateSenator Houchin added as coauthor
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senators Becker, Messmer and Tomes

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/480/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/5/8/fc586a5e/SB0480.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/2/8/cd28d814/SB0480.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/4/f/e34f3cbf/SB0480.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/8/b/408b9968/SB0480.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/1/3/c/113cc093/SB0480.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/8/4/6a84f89b/SB0480.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/e/3/1/5e317024/SB0480.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/2/1/e321fbd0/SB0480.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/e/7/75e7e137/SB0480.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/1/f/0/61f03f92/SB0480.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/3/4/e/f34e7a25/SB0480.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/1/e/8d1e3950/SB0480.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/0/1/0/a010d1c6/SB0480.93.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/7/b/107b8c92/SB0480.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/9/0/6090923c/SB0480.422.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/2/3/c/723c1cd4/SB0480.511.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback