IN SB0478 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Public Law 236
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Utility easements. Establishes a framework for resolving disputes between electricity suppliers and property owners regarding the attachment or installation of communications infrastructure within an electric easement. Provides that the procedures apply only to an electricity supplier that is a rural electric membership corporation. Provides specified exemptions from the procedures. Specifies that the bill's provisions provide the exclusive remedy to a property owner with respect to the attachment or installation of communications infrastructure on above ground electric facilities within an electric easement. Specifies that the bill's provisions do not provide the exclusive remedy to a property owner if the terms of:

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Utility easements. Establishes a framework for resolving disputes between electricity suppliers and property owners regarding the attachment or installation of communications infrastructure within an electric easement. Provides that the procedures apply only to an electricity supplier that is a rural electric membership corporation. Provides specified exemptions from the procedures. Specifies that the bill's provisions provide the exclusive remedy to a property owner with respect to the attachment or installation of communications infrastructure on above ground electric facilities within an electric easement. Specifies that the bill's provisions do not provide the exclusive remedy to a property owner if the terms of:

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House - Motion to divide the question on Amendment #1 (Pierce) prevailed (Y: 61 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28SenatePublic Law 236
2017-04-28SenateSigned by the Governor
2017-04-25SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-21HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-21SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-21SenateConference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 497: yeas 49, nays 1
2017-04-20HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 513: yeas 96, nays 2
2017-04-20SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2017-04-20HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2017-04-13SenateSenator Zay added as coauthor
2017-04-12HouseRepresentative Negele added as advisor
2017-04-11HouseHouse advisors appointed: Lehman, Bacon, Cherry and Pierce
2017-04-11HouseHouse conferees appointed: Ober and Hatfield
2017-04-10SenateSenate advisors appointed: Merritt, Lanane and Zay
2017-04-10SenateSenate conferees appointed: Koch and Stoops
2017-04-10SenateMotion to dissent filed
2017-04-10SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2017-04-07HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2017-04-06HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 418: yeas 95, nays 2
2017-04-05HouseAmendment #1 (Ober) Question 2 [Sec. 18] prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-05HouseAmendment #1 (Ober) Question 1 [Sec. 17] failed; voice vote
2017-04-05HouseMotion to divide the question on Amendment #1 (Pierce) prevailed; Roll Call 395: yeas 61, nays 31
2017-04-05HouseAmendment #2 (Hatfield) prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-05HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-04-03HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-03-28HouseRepresentative Ober added as cosponsor
2017-03-28HouseRepresentative Lehman added as sponsor
2017-03-28HouseRepresentative Ober removed as sponsor
2017-03-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications
2017-03-01SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-28SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2017-02-28SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2017-02-28SenateCosponsors: Representatives Negele and DeVon
2017-02-28SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Ober
2017-02-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 237: yeas 48, nays 2
2017-02-27SenateSenator Houchin added as coauthor
2017-02-27SenateAmendment #3 (Koch) prevailed; voice vote
2017-02-27SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-02-23SenateSenator Charbonneau added as coauthor
2017-02-20SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-16SenateSenator Leising added as coauthor
2017-02-16SenateSenator Lanane added as coauthor
2017-02-13SenateSenator Merritt added as second author
2017-01-12SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Utilities
2017-01-12SenateAuthored by Senator Koch

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/senate/478/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/c/c/a/1cca68a3/SB0478.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/7/7/4377c815/SB0478.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/9/e/ca9eb3d8/SB0478.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/2/0/c/d20c08a0/SB0478.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/a/6/e/2a6e2fa6/SB0478.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/0/b/5/a0b56ae5/SB0478.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/2/4/9a248e67/SB0478.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/4/a/b/94abb814/SB0478.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/8/7/7/5877a934/SB0478.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/e/4/7ce40dee/SB0478.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/0/0/ff00a18d/SB0478.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/3/6/c5363e33/SB0478.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/0/5/6/705644d4/SB0478.237.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/9/f/099f6670/SB0478.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/2/2/44228b2d/House_Rule_81.395.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/8/4/2/184265e9/SB0478.418.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/8/2/f482474a/SB0478.513.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/a/6/38a66bf7/SB0478.497.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback