IN SB0478 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - Representative GiaQuinta added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - Representative GiaQuinta added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Transportation funding. Provides that a redevelopment commission of a municipality may provide revenue to a public transportation corporation from property tax proceeds allocated to the redevelopment commission in a tax increment financing area. Limits the amount of revenue to the amount of property tax revenue received by the municipality's redevelopment commission that is attributable to the public transportation corporation's tax rate. Requires a joint public hearing of the municipality's legislative body and the municipality's redevelopment commission and the adoption of substantially similar authorizing resolutions. Provides that a redevelopment commission may provide revenue to a school corporation, for deposit in the
Title
Transportation funding. Provides that a redevelopment commission of a municipality may provide revenue to a public transportation corporation from property tax proceeds allocated to the redevelopment commission in a tax increment financing area. Limits the amount of revenue to the amount of property tax revenue received by the municipality's redevelopment commission that is attributable to the public transportation corporation's tax rate. Requires a joint public hearing of the municipality's legislative body and the municipality's redevelopment commission and the adoption of substantially similar authorizing resolutions. Provides that a redevelopment commission may provide revenue to a school corporation, for deposit in the
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Brown [R] | Sen. Howard Kenley [R] | Sen. Ryan Mishler [R] | Sen. John Broden [D] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Robert Morris [R] | Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] | Rep. Philip GiaQuinta [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | House | Representative GiaQuinta added as cosponsor |
2015-03-05 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Representative Carbaugh added as cosponsor |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Representative Morris added as sponsor |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 133: yeas 45, nays 5 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senator Broden added as coauthor |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senator Mishler added as third author |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senator Kenley added as second author |
2015-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brown L |