IN SB0476 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Representative DeLaney added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Grain buyers and warehouse licensing. Makes numerous changes to the operations and procedures of the grain indemnity fund board (board) and the grain indemnity fund. Requires that a person applying for or renewing a license who does not conduct business at an Indiana address must appoint a registered agent in Indiana. Provides that violations of certain confidentiality agreements are Class B infractions. Provides that grain that has been delivered to a first purchaser for sale or storage under a bailment to a licensee within 15 months before the date of failure of the licensee may be considered in determining the

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grain buyers and warehouse licensing. Makes numerous changes to the operations and procedures of the grain indemnity fund board (board) and the grain indemnity fund. Requires that a person applying for or renewing a license who does not conduct business at an Indiana address must appoint a registered agent in Indiana. Provides that violations of certain confidentiality agreements are Class B infractions. Provides that grain that has been delivered to a first purchaser for sale or storage under a bailment to a licensee within 15 months before the date of failure of the licensee may be considered in determining the

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-13HouseRepresentative DeLaney added as cosponsor
2017-02-28HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
2017-02-15SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-13SenateSenator Kruse added as third author
2017-02-13SenateCosponsor: Representative Lehe
2017-02-13SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Baird
2017-02-13SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 98: yeas 49, nays 0
2017-02-09SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-02-06SenateSenator Leising added as second author
2017-02-06SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-12SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture
2017-01-12SenateAuthored by Senator Boots

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback