IN SB0476 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-13 - Public Law 232
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

School capital projects fund tax rate. Provides that when calculating the maximum rate for a school corporation's capital projects fund for taxes due and payable in calendar year 2016, the first step in the calculation (the previous year's maximum rate) shall be the larger of: (1) the actual maximum rate for the school corporation's capital projects fund for the previous year; or (2) the maximum rate that would have been established for the school corporation's capital project fund for the previous year if the formula used in current law to determine the maximum rate had been in effect for each

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School capital projects fund tax rate. Provides that when calculating the maximum rate for a school corporation's capital projects fund for taxes due and payable in calendar year 2016, the first step in the calculation (the previous year's maximum rate) shall be the larger of: (1) the actual maximum rate for the school corporation's capital projects fund for the previous year; or (2) the maximum rate that would have been established for the school corporation's capital project fund for the previous year if the formula used in current law to determine the maximum rate had been in effect for each

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-28 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-13SenatePublic Law 232
2015-05-07SenateSigned by the Governor
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-29SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-04-28HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 555: yeas 83, nays 0
2015-04-28SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 527: yeas 47, nays 0
2015-04-21HouseHouse Advisors appointed: Morrison, Huston, Goodin and Niezgodski
2015-04-21HouseHouse Conferees appointed: Friend and Porter
2015-04-20SenateSenate Advisors appointed: Kenley, Taylor, Hershman and Perfect
2015-04-20SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Head and Rogers
2015-04-20SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2015-04-20SenateMotion to dissent filed
2015-04-20SenateConcurrrence withdrawn
2015-04-16SenateMotion to concur filed
2015-04-16HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2015-04-15HouseRepresentative Morrison added as cosponsor
2015-04-15HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 455: yeas 97, nays 0
2015-04-14HouseAmendment #1 (Morrison) prevailed; voice vote
2015-04-14HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-04-09HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-03-05HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2015-02-16SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-09SenateRepresentative Friend added as sponsor
2015-02-09SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 114: yeas 49, nays 0
2015-02-05SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2015-02-05SenateAmendment #2 (Head) prevailed; voice vote
2015-02-05SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-02-02SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2015-01-29SenateSenators Raatz and Rogers added as coauthors
2015-01-29SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-27SenateSenator Kenley added as second author
2015-01-14SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2015-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Head

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/senate/476/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/e/a/5/aea585fb/SB0476.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/c/a/1/1ca15319/SB0476.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/b/6/8fb6fad9/SB0476.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/7/f/d67fdf34/SB0476.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/4/f/b74f0481/SB0476.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/9/b/079b9742/SB0476.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/7/0/1/67017ba6/SB0476.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/3/1/4e3119e3/SB0476.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/e/f/69efcf19/SB0476.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/1/b/481bc5fe/SB0476.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/5/4/7d5448e5/SB0476.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/9/6/1496bc88/SB0476.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/5/2/f552f21f/SB0476.114.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/a/f/50af57ad/SB0476.03.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/4/6/2746acdf/SB0476.455.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/e/f/42ef3763/SB0476.527.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/7/f/367fabe5/SB0476.555.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback