IN SB0474 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Public Law 37
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Public Law 37
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Probation and parole for animal abusers. Defines "animal abuse offense" and "companion animal", and establishes as a mandatory condition of probation and parole that a person convicted of an animal abuse offense may not own, harbor, or train a companion animal.
Title
Probation and parole for animal abusers. Defines "animal abuse offense" and "companion animal", and establishes as a mandatory condition of probation and parole that a person convicted of an animal abuse offense may not own, harbor, or train a companion animal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Public Law 37 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2019-04-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 398: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2019-04-01 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-28 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-03-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Lehe and Klinker |
2019-02-05 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Negele |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 84: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senators Becker, Taylor G, Ford J.D. added as coauthors |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as third author |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as second author |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Alting |