IN SB0473 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Public Law 116
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Public Law 116
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limits on discharges into the Ohio River. Provides that if a community water system that discharges wastewater into the Ohio River demonstrates to the satisfaction of the department of environmental management that the discharged wastewater does not increase the mass of mercury in the Ohio River by an amount greater than the mass of mercury in the water withdrawn from the Ohio River by the community water system: (1) the community water system's discharge into the Ohio River shall not be considered to cause, have a reasonable potential to cause, or contribute to an excursion above any applicable water quality standard governing mercury in the Ohio River; and (2) no water quality-based effluent limitations for mercury shall be required in a new or renewal NPDES permit issued to the community water system.
Title
Limits on discharges into the Ohio River.
Sponsors
Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Sen. Rick Niemeyer [R] | Sen. James Tomes [R] | Rep. Timothy O'Brien [R] |
Rep. Ryan Hatfield [D] | Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] | Rep. Matt Hostettler [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Public Law 116 |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 360: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2023-04-04 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 362: yeas 95, nays 2 |
2023-04-04 | House | Representative Hostettler added as cosponsor |
2023-04-04 | House | Representative McNamara added as cosponsor |
2023-04-03 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-03-30 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-03-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Hatfield |
2023-02-23 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative O'Brien |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 156: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 35 (c); technical correction committee report adopted |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Becker) prevailed; voice vote |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-19 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Authored by Senators Becker, Niemeyer and Tomes |