IN SB0472 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Public Law 122
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Public Law 122
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests to locate underground utility facilities. Amends the statute concerning the locating and marking of underground utility facilities (Indiana's 811 law) to allow a person responsible for: (1) a construction project; or (2) any other project or operation; that will involve an excavation or demolition operation to provide a voluntary design information notice to the association known as the Indiana Underground Plant Protection Service (association) before commencing preliminary engineering studies or construction planning activities in the project area that will be affected by the excavation or demolition. Provides that a design information notice must be received by the association at
Title
Requests to locate underground utility facilities. Amends the statute concerning the locating and marking of underground utility facilities (Indiana's 811 law) to allow a person responsible for: (1) a construction project; or (2) any other project or operation; that will involve an excavation or demolition operation to provide a voluntary design information notice to the association known as the Indiana Underground Plant Protection Service (association) before commencing preliminary engineering studies or construction planning activities in the project area that will be affected by the excavation or demolition. Provides that a design information notice must be received by the association at
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. James Merritt [R] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] | Rep. Dale DeVon [R] |
Rep. Karlee Macer [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 84 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 84 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | Senate | Public Law 122 |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 465: yeas 37, nays 0 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2017-04-05 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 389: yeas 84, nays 2 |
2017-04-04 | House | Amendment #1 (Pryor) motion withdrawn voice vote |
2017-04-04 | House | Amendment #2 (Ellington) motion withdrawn voice vote |
2017-04-04 | House | Amendment #3 (DeVon) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-04-04 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-03-21 | House | Representative Macer added as cosponsor |
2017-03-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-27 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative DeVon |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 208: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as second author |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-12 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crider |