IN SB0470 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Study of issues related to student assessments. Urges the legislative council to assign to the appropriate study committee the topic of studying issues related to the development by the state board of education of acceptable tests from which all schools may select a test that meets the requirements of IC 20-32 concerning student standards, assessments, and performance.
Title
Study of issues related to student assessments. Urges the legislative council to assign to the appropriate study committee the topic of studying issues related to the development by the state board of education of acceptable tests from which all schools may select a test that meets the requirements of IC 20-32 concerning student standards, assessments, and performance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education & Career Development - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education & Career Development - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senator Bassler added as third author |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Representative Thompson added as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 256: yeas 45, nays 5 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as second author |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to committee on Appropriations |
2015-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Education & Career Development |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Schneider |