IN SB0467 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-07 - First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-07 - First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Fire department reimbursement. Requires payment under a property insurance policy that provides coverage for reimbursement for fire protection services (policy) to pay the fire department's charges, subject to certain limitations, in response to a claim for which the insurer is liable under the policy. Requires notice to the claimant when a fire department is reimbursed under a policy.
Title
Fire department reimbursement. Requires payment under a property insurance policy that provides coverage for reimbursement for fire protection services (policy) to pay the fire department's charges, subject to certain limitations, in response to a claim for which the insurer is liable under the policy. Requires notice to the claimant when a fire department is reimbursed under a policy.
Sponsors
Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Rep. Michael Karickhoff [R] | Rep. Cindy Kirchhofer [R] |
Rep. Kevin Mahan [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Kirchhofer and Mahan |
2017-02-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Karickhoff |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 236: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as second author |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Buck) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-12 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senator Buck |