IN SB0466 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Public Law 121
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Public Law 121
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Termination of retired legislator health coverage. Specifies that eligibility of certain former legislators and family members to continue participation in retired state employee group health insurance coverage ends on the date on which the former legislator takes office in a public office to which the former legislator is elected after December 31, 2016, and through which the former legislator may obtain health coverage.
Title
Termination of retired legislator health coverage. Specifies that eligibility of certain former legislators and family members to continue participation in retired state employee group health insurance coverage ends on the date on which the former legislator takes office in a public office to which the former legislator is elected after December 31, 2016, and through which the former legislator may obtain health coverage.
Sponsors
Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. Frank Mrvan [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. David Frizzell [R] | Rep. Matt Pierce [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | Senate | Public Law 121 |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-05 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2017-04-04 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 383: yeas 99, nays 0 |
2017-04-03 | House | Representative Pierce added as cosponsor |
2017-04-03 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-23 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Frizzell |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 181: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as second author |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Buck) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as coauthor |
2017-01-12 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senator Buck |