IN SB0464 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Public Law 155
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Homeless children and youths. Allows certain representatives of a homeless youth to: (1) access, on behalf of the youth, the youth's birth certificate, photo identification, and driver's license without charge or consent of a parent, guardian, or custodian; and (2) enroll the youth in adult basic education services and register the youth for the Indiana high school equivalency examination, after the youth completes an exit interview with the youth's school corporation; if the youth meets certain guidelines and the representative possesses a fee and consent waiver affidavit. Updates the law regarding the education of homeless children and youth to align with federal law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homeless children and youths. Allows certain representatives of a homeless youth to: (1) access, on behalf of the youth, the youth's birth certificate, photo identification, and driver's license without charge or consent of a parent, guardian, or custodian; and (2) enroll the youth in adult basic education services and register the youth for the Indiana high school equivalency examination, after the youth completes an exit interview with the youth's school corporation; if the youth meets certain guidelines and the representative possesses a fee and consent waiver affidavit. Updates the law regarding the education of homeless children and youth to align with federal law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenatePublic Law 155
2019-05-01SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-18SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 533: yeas 36, nays 10
2019-04-16SenateMotion to concur filed
2019-04-16HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-04-15HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 515: yeas 92, nays 0
2019-04-11HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-04-09HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-26HouseRepresentative Cook added as cosponsor
2019-03-18HouseRepresentative Pryor added as cosponsor
2019-03-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
2019-02-27SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-26SenateHouse sponsor: Representative DeVon
2019-02-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 239: yeas 48, nays 1
2019-02-25SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-02-25SenateSenator Melton added as coauthor
2019-02-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-29SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as third author
2019-01-29SenateSenator Head added as second author
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Merritt

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/464/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/a/9/c/0a9c1521/SB0464.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/e/5/32e52e65/SB0464.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/b/f/cdbfafd7/SB0464.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/d/e/0/4de0402d/SB0464.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/6/7/7c678c06/SB0464.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/3/d/7/f3d7faaa/SB0464.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/7/5/9c75f6b6/SB0464.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/2/5/db25049a/SB0464.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/3/7/d/637deb55/SB0464.239.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/f/e/d/4fedabd1/SB0464.02.COMS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/a/7/b/2a7b5c3d/SB0464.515.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/2/2/c822224e/SB0464.533.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback