IN SB0464 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Defines "public servant", and substitutes "public servants" for "public officers" with respect to certain duties and obligations concerning public funds. Makes knowingly or intentionally failing to properly deposit public funds a Class A misdemeanor, and increases the penalty to a Class D felony if the amount involved is at least $750 and to a Class C felony if the amount involved is at least $50,000. (The offense is currently a Class B felony.) Repeals a conflicting provision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Depository rule.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-21 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House - Roll Call 598 (Y: 58 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 107
2011-05-09 Signed by the Governor
2011-05-02 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-27 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-26 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-21 Returned to the Senate without amendments
2011-04-21 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 634: yeas 83, nays 0
2011-04-20 Amendment 1 (Goodin), ruled out of order
2011-04-20 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-04-18 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2011-02-15 Cosponsors: Reps. Grubb and Sullivan
2011-02-15 House sponsor: Rep. Foley
2011-02-15 Referred to the House
2011-02-15 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 130: yeas 50 and nays 0
2011-02-14 Senator Arnold added as coauthor
2011-02-14 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-02-07 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-01-13 First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters
2011-01-13 Authored by Senator Bray

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback