IN SB0463 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Public Law 231
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Cigarettes and tobacco sales. Prohibits the sale at retail of an electronic cigarette without a valid tobacco sales certificate issued by the alcohol and tobacco commission (commission) and includes electronic cigarettes in the certification regulation statutes. Provides that the commission may not enforce an action regarding tobacco sales certificates and electronic cigarettes until after August 31, 2015. Permits smoking in certain cigar stores and bars. Removes the requirement that members of a club or fraternal club must vote to allow smoking on the premises. Provides that the club or fraternal club may allow guests in the designated smoking room or

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cigarettes and tobacco sales. Prohibits the sale at retail of an electronic cigarette without a valid tobacco sales certificate issued by the alcohol and tobacco commission (commission) and includes electronic cigarettes in the certification regulation statutes. Provides that the commission may not enforce an action regarding tobacco sales certificates and electronic cigarettes until after August 31, 2015. Permits smoking in certain cigar stores and bars. Removes the requirement that members of a club or fraternal club must vote to allow smoking on the premises. Provides that the club or fraternal club may allow guests in the designated smoking room or

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 85 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 84 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce & Technology - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-07SenatePublic Law 231
2015-05-07SenateSigned by the Governor
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-29SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-29SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 535: yeas 40, nays 8
2015-04-29SenateSenator Alting added as third author
2015-04-28HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 567: yeas 85, nays 10
2015-04-20HouseHouse Advisors appointed: Clere, Dermody, Austin and GiaQuinta
2015-04-20HouseHouse Conferees appointed: Brown T and Brown C
2015-04-20SenateSenate Advisors appointed: Merritt, Broden and Boots
2015-04-20SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Miller Patricia and Randolph
2015-04-20SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2015-04-16SenateMotion to dissent filed
2015-04-15HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2015-04-14HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 440: yeas 84, nays 11
2015-04-13HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-04-09HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-04-02HouseRepresentative Clere added as cosponsor
2015-03-03HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2015-02-24SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-23SenateRepresentative Brown, C. added as cosponsor
2015-02-23SenateRepresentative Brown, T. added as sponsor
2015-02-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 213: yeas 42, nays 7
2015-02-19SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-02-17SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-02-17SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Rules & Legislative Procedure
2015-02-16SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2015-02-12SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2015-02-10SenateSenator Merritt added as second author
2015-01-14SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Commerce & Technology
2015-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Miller Patricia

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/senate/463/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/d/3/b7d372c1/SB0463.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/8/1/8/18182539/SB0463.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/8/b/9/e8b98e17/SB0463.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/3/a/993a4041/SB0463.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/1/a/e11aeec5/SB0463.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/6/b/556b630c/SB0463.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/3/c/b33c2450/SB0463.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/f/c/a9fce89d/SB0463.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/e/b/42ebf67e/SB0463.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/f/4/5df47c2b/SB0463.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/8/d/a/b8da4a88/SB0463.213.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/c/1/9/ec19b37a/SB0463.03.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/d/4/9/2d498680/SB0463.440.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/c/7/54c787a3/SB0463.567.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/0/d/dd0debda/SB0463.535.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback