IN SB0460 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 21 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-21 - Returned to the Senate with amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Requires and sets forth the procedure for an institutional provider and a noninstitutional provider to reimburse the office of the secretary of family and social services for, or appeal a determination of, certain Medicaid overpayments made to the provider. Provides that a provider has to repay an overpayment within 300 days instead of 60 days. Extends the collection of a nursing facility quality assessment fee until June 30, 2014. Changes the amount collected and the distribution of the fee revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Long term care issues.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-21 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - House - Amendment 3 (Culver), prevailed (Y: 63 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 2 (Simpson), failed (Y: 6 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-21 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2011-04-21 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 625: yeas 88, nays 1
2011-04-20 Amendment 3 (Culver), prevailed; Roll Call 597: yeas 63, nays 27
2011-04-20 Amendment 2 (T. Brown), prevailed; voice vote
2011-04-20 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2011-04-13 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-04-05 Representative Welch added as cosponsor
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2011-02-22 Cosponsors: Reps. Espich and C. Brown
2011-02-22 House sponsor: Rep. T. Brown
2011-02-22 Referred to the House
2011-02-22 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 239: yeas 34 and nays 15
2011-02-21 Amendment 2 (Simpson), failed; Roll Call 178: yeas 13, nays 37
2011-02-21 Amendment 1 (Miller), prevailed;
2011-02-21 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2011-02-17 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-01-27 Committee report: amended, reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2011-01-18 Senator Breaux added as third author
2011-01-18 Senator Lawson added as second author
2011-01-12 First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2011-01-12 Authored by Senator Miller

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2011&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SB&docno=0460
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/IN/IN0460.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/SB/SB0460.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/SB/SB0460.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/SB/SB0460.3.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/ES/ES0460.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/ES/ES0460.2.html
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Srollcal/0178.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Srollcal/0239.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Hrollcal/0597.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Hrollcal/0625.PDF.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback