IN SB0459 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 04/28/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Makes changes concerning calling services, durable medical equipment, and reliance on the department of state revenue's taxability matrix under the state gross retail and use taxes to bring the state into compliance with the Streamlined Sale and Use Tax Agreement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Streamlined sales and use tax conformity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-18 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective 04/28/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 84
2011-04-28 Signed by the Governor
2011-04-25 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-21 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-20 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-18 Returned to the Senate without amendments
2011-04-18 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 551: yeas 93, nays 4
2011-04-15 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-04-13 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2011-01-31 Cosponsor: Rep. Welch
2011-01-31 House sponsor: Rep. Espich
2011-01-31 Referred to the House
2011-01-31 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 59: yeas 40 and nays 9
2011-01-27 Senator Broden added as coauthor
2011-01-27 Amendment 1 (Walker), withdrawn
2011-01-27 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-01-25 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-01-12 First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2011-01-12 Authored by Senator Kenley

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback