IN SB0454 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
Pending: Senate Tax and Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
Pending: Senate Tax and Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans' programs and scratch off game. Requires the state lottery commission to adopt rules to establish a scratch-off game to benefit Indiana veterans. Deposits revenue from sales of tickets for the scratch-off game into the veterans' treatment fund, the veterans service officer fund, and to the lottery commission for operating costs. Establishes the veterans service officer fund. Requires the director of the department of veterans' affairs (department) to give notice of the existence of the veterans' treatment program (program) to each individual in Indiana who has a traumatic brain injury or posttraumatic stress disorder related to the individual's service as
Title
Veterans' programs and scratch off game. Requires the state lottery commission to adopt rules to establish a scratch-off game to benefit Indiana veterans. Deposits revenue from sales of tickets for the scratch-off game into the veterans' treatment fund, the veterans service officer fund, and to the lottery commission for operating costs. Establishes the veterans service officer fund. Requires the director of the department of veterans' affairs (department) to give notice of the existence of the veterans' treatment program (program) to each individual in Indiana who has a traumatic brain injury or posttraumatic stress disorder related to the individual's service as
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senators Doriot, Melton, Niezgodski, Sandlin, Niemeyer, Ford, Merritt added as coauthors |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as third author |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senator Crider added as second author |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Veterans Affairs and The Military |
2017-01-12 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senator Delph |