IN SB0451 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Crime stoppers and restitution. Defines "crime stoppers" and provides that the court may order a person to pay restitution to crime stoppers if crime stoppers paid an award for a tip.
Title
Crime stoppers and restitution.
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Busch [R] | Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] |
Rep. Robert Morris [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor |
2020-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Morris |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 199: yeas 46, nays 3 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as third author |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Young M added as second author |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-16 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Authored by Senator Busch |