IN SB0443 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 196
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 196
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Various education matters. Requires the department of education to, not later than November 1, 2023, do the following: (1) Create a list of personal liability insurers that offer personal liability insurance policies for teachers. (2) Post the list on the department's website. Provides that the academic standards committee appointed by the secretary of education must include employers (in addition to other members under current law). Provides that a school psychologist may provide services on a private basis to an individual if the school psychologist receives a referral from the individual's parent and the individual is an unemancipated minor.
Title
Various education matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Senate | Public Law 196 |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2023-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 458: yeas 40, nays 2 |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2023-04-12 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2023-04-11 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 389: yeas 96, nays 1 |
2023-04-10 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-04-06 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-03-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2023-03-23 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-03-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Goodrich, Behning, Davis M |
2023-02-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Teshka |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 204: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senators Buchanan and Donato added as coauthors |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senator Johnson added as coauthor |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senator Crane added as third author |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as second author |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-19 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rogers |