IN SB0443 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Public Law 118
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Public Law 118
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform business organization laws. Enacts provisions of the Uniform Business Organization Code, including the Uniform Model Registered Agents Act and the Uniform Model Entity Transactions Act. Makes conforming changes.
Title
Uniform business organization laws. Enacts provisions of the Uniform Business Organization Code, including the Uniform Model Registered Agents Act and the Uniform Model Entity Transactions Act. Makes conforming changes.
Sponsors
Sen. Rodric Bray [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Timothy Lanane [D] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] | Rep. Edward DeLaney [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Floor - (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Floor - (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | Senate | Public Law 118 |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 357: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2017-03-20 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 269: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2017-03-16 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-13 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-03-09 | House | Representative DeLaney added as cosponsor |
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2017-02-14 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Carbaugh |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 124: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Bray) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as coauthor |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senator Messmer added as third author |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Senator Koch added as second author |
2017-01-12 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bray |