IN SB0443 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Various education matters. Allows grants from the safe schools fund to provide schoolwide programs to improve school climate and professional development and training in alternatives to suspension and expulsion and evidence based practices that contribute to a positive school environment. Provides that an election for a student to have legal settlement in the school corporation whose attendance area contains the residence of the student's mother or father shall be made on a yearly basis and applies throughout the school year unless the student's mother or father no longer resides within the attendance area of the school corporation. Provides that a
Title
Various education matters. Allows grants from the safe schools fund to provide schoolwide programs to improve school climate and professional development and training in alternatives to suspension and expulsion and evidence based practices that contribute to a positive school environment. Provides that an election for a student to have legal settlement in the school corporation whose attendance area contains the residence of the student's mother or father shall be made on a yearly basis and applies throughout the school year unless the student's mother or father no longer resides within the attendance area of the school corporation. Provides that a
Sponsors
Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Pete Miller [R] | Sen. Earline Rogers [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. Robert Behning [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education & Career Development - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education & Career Development - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Representative Behning added as sponsor |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 131: yeas 35, nays 15 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as coauthor |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Senator Miller, Pete added as second author |
2015-01-12 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Education & Career Development |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kruse |