IN SB0441 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Senator Head added as second author
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Senator Head added as second author
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interest on judgments for money. Provides that the payment of interest on judgments for money shall be paid at the following rate if there was no contract between the parties to the suit, or if a rate of interest was not agreed upon in the original contract sued upon: (1) An annual rate of 8%, with respect to the accrual of interest before July 1, 2019, on any part of a judgment that is paid before July 1, 2019. (2) The lesser of: (A) 8%; or (B) the applicable adjusted rate of interest calculated by the department of state revenue for the nonpayment of taxes as of the date of payment of the interest on the judgment; with respect to the accrual of interest after June 30, 2019, on any part of a judgment that is unpaid after June 30, 2019, even if the judgment was rendered before July 1, 2019.
Title
Interest on judgments for money. Provides that the payment of interest on judgments for money shall be paid at the following rate if there was no contract between the parties to the suit, or if a rate of interest was not agreed upon in the original contract sued upon: (1) An annual rate of 8%, with respect to the accrual of interest before July 1, 2019, on any part of a judgment that is paid before July 1, 2019. (2) The lesser of: (A) 8%; or (B) the applicable adjusted rate of interest calculated by the department of state revenue for the nonpayment of taxes as of the date of payment of the interest on the judgment; with respect to the accrual of interest after June 30, 2019, on any part of a judgment that is unpaid after June 30, 2019, even if the judgment was rendered before July 1, 2019.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. Randall Head [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Head added as second author |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ford Jon |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/441/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/4/0/01408e6c/SB0441.01.INTR.pdf |