IN SB0441 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Public Law 250
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Various tax matters. Eliminates the World War I veteran property tax deduction for property taxes imposed for an assessment date after 2015. Provides that the equipment eligible for the double direct sales tax exemption includes material handling equipment purchased for the purpose of transporting materials into production activities from an onsite location. Provides that: (1) the cutting of steel bars into billets; and (2) the felling of trees for further use in production or for sale in the ordinary course of business; is to be treated as processing of tangible personal property for purposes of the double direct sales tax

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various tax matters. Eliminates the World War I veteran property tax deduction for property taxes imposed for an assessment date after 2015. Provides that the equipment eligible for the double direct sales tax exemption includes material handling equipment purchased for the purpose of transporting materials into production activities from an onsite location. Provides that: (1) the cutting of steel bars into billets; and (2) the felling of trees for further use in production or for sale in the ordinary course of business; is to be treated as processing of tangible personal property for purposes of the double direct sales tax

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House - Amendment #4 (Austin) prevailed (Y: 78 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Porter) failed (Y: 29 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-04-01 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Broden) failed (Y: 10 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-06SenatePublic Law 250
2015-05-06SenateSigned by the Governor
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-05-01HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-29HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 599: yeas 99, nays 0
2015-04-29SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 572: yeas 45, nays 4
2015-04-20SenateSenator Broden removed as advisor
2015-04-20SenateSenator Randolph added as advisor
2015-04-20SenateSenator Broden added as conferee
2015-04-20SenateSenator Randolph removed as conferee
2015-04-16HouseHouse Advisors appointed: Braun, Ober and Goodin
2015-04-16HouseHouse Conferees appointed: Huston and Stemler
2015-04-14SenateSenate Advisors appointed: Steele, Broden, Ford and Messmer
2015-04-14SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Hershman and Randolph
2015-04-14SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2015-04-14SenateMotion to dissent filed
2015-04-14HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2015-04-13HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 400: yeas 88, nays 6
2015-04-09HouseAmendment #4 (Austin) prevailed; Roll Call 396: yeas 78, nays 16
2015-04-09HouseAmendment #1 (Porter) failed; Roll Call 395: yeas 28, nays 68
2015-04-09HouseAmendment #3 (Clere) prevailed; voice vote
2015-04-09HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-04-02HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-03-24HouseRepresentative Clere added as cosponsor
2015-03-12HouseRepresentative Goodin added as cosponsor
2015-03-10HouseRepresentative Stemler added as cosponsor
2015-03-03HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2015-02-20SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-19SenateRepresentative Huston added as sponsor
2015-02-19SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 189: yeas 42, nays 7
2015-02-17SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2015-02-17SenateAmendment #3 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote
2015-02-17SenateAmendment #1 (Broden) failed; Roll Call 159: yeas 10, nays 39
2015-02-17SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-02-16SenateSenator Steele added as second author
2015-02-12SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-02-10SenateSenator Broden added as coauthor
2015-01-12SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
2015-01-12SenateAuthored by Senator Hershman

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/senate/441/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/d/a/5/bda5e156/SB0441.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/f/3/c5f3c50b/SB0441.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/e/d/16ed4842/SB0441.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/e/2/3/be23b551/SB0441.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/a/6/12a64c9f/SB0441.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/a/9/f/0a9fef29/SB0441.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/6/7/66678a28/SB0441.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/e/3/50e3a3c6/SB0441.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/3/8/9138e519/SB0441.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/6/6/3/f663f167/SB0441.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/4/0/2c40afe0/SB0441.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/a/b/9/7ab9a95b/SB0441.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/4/b/1/84b10c24/SB0441.159.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/c/3/8/1c38ec50/SB0441.189.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/d/c/41dc6961/SB0441.03.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/e/9/cbe9d7f8/SB0441.395.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/0/8/14088cc4/SB0441.396.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/5/b/6/e5b627e3/SB0441.400.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/6/1/1e619977/SB0441.599.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/1/2/2f1274e0/SB0441.572.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback