IN SB0440 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Public Law 73
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Public Law 73
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Various tax matters. Requires the party that petitions for equitable allocation and apportionment of state income tax to bear the burden of proof that the standard allocation and apportionment provisions do not fairly represent the taxpayer's income derived from sources within Indiana and that the proposed alternative method to the standard allocation and apportionment provisions is reasonable. Requires the department of state revenue (department) to adopt certain procedures for department employees to follow in mailing documents that provide notice to a taxpayer. Specifies the content of a notice to a taxpayer that establishes a deadline for the taxpayer to act
Title
Various tax matters. Requires the party that petitions for equitable allocation and apportionment of state income tax to bear the burden of proof that the standard allocation and apportionment provisions do not fairly represent the taxpayer's income derived from sources within Indiana and that the proposed alternative method to the standard allocation and apportionment provisions is reasonable. Requires the department of state revenue (department) to adopt certain procedures for department employees to follow in mailing documents that provide notice to a taxpayer. Specifies the content of a notice to a taxpayer that establishes a deadline for the taxpayer to act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Shackleford) failed (Y: 31 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-03-20 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Hamilton) failed (Y: 29 N: 65 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-03-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Shackleford) failed (Y: 31 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-03-20 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Hamilton) failed (Y: 29 N: 65 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-03-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Public Law 73 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 356: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2017-03-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 294: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2017-03-20 | House | Amendment #3 (Shackleford) failed; Roll Call 274: yeas 31, nays 66 |
2017-03-20 | House | Amendment #2 (Hamilton) failed; Roll Call 273: yeas 29, nays 65 |
2017-03-20 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-16 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-03-06 | House | Representative Huston added as cosponsor |
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-16 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Leonard |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 131: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as second author |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-12 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holdman |