IN SB0434 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that after June 30, 2011: (1) a retail handgun dealer's license is valid for six years from the date the license is issued instead of two years; and (2) the fee to obtain the license is $60 instead of $20.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retail handgun dealer's licenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-08 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 44
2011-04-20 Signed by the Governor
2011-04-15 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-13 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-12 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-08 Returned to the Senate without amendments
2011-04-08 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 446: yeas 84, nays 5
2011-04-07 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-04-04 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2011-01-25 Senator Buck added as third author
2011-01-25 Cosponsor: Rep. Battles
2011-01-25 House sponsor: Rep. Messmer
2011-01-25 Referred to the House
2011-01-25 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 43: yeas 49 and nays 0
2011-01-20 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-01-18 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-01-12 First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters
2011-01-12 Authored by Senators Hume and Tomes

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback