IN SB0433 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 203
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 203
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Abandoned property; property safety; mobile homes.
Title
Abandoned property; property safety; mobile homes.
Sponsors
Sen. James Merritt [R] | Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Sen. Allen Paul [R] | Sen. Jean Leising [R] |
Sen. John Broden [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-26 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 203 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-26 | House | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 656: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 579: yeas 45, nays 4 |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-04-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-24 | House | House advisors appointed: Saunders, Moed and Forestal |
2013-04-24 | House | House conferees appointed: Hamm and Pryor |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate advisor appointed: Merritt and Breaux |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate conferee appointed: Paul and Broden |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Concurrence withdrawn |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Motion to concur in House amendments filed |
2013-04-10 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2013-04-10 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 455: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2013-04-04 | House | Representative Price added as cosponsor |
2013-04-04 | House | House Rule 105.1 suspended |
2013-04-04 | House | Amendment 1 (Forestal), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-04 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-03-18 | House | Representative Forestal added as cosponsor |
2013-03-12 | House | Representative Moed added as cosponsor |
2013-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senators Leising and Broden added as coauthors |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Cosponsor: Rep. Saunders |
2013-02-12 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Hamm |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 115: yeas 49 and nays 0 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as third author |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as second author |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Amendment 1 (Holdman), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Paul |