IN SB0431 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - SECTION 5 effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the department of toxicology as a state agency. (Currently, the department of toxicology is part of Indiana University.) Makes conforming changes. Creates the toxicology department advisory council. Repeals the law pertaining to the department of toxicology that is part of Indiana University.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of toxicology.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 86 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - House - Amendment 1 (L. Lawson), prevailed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 SECTION 5 effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-18 SECTION 4 effective 05/10/2011
2011-05-18 SECTIONS 1 through 3 effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 158
2011-05-10 Signed by the Governor
2011-05-04 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-29 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-29 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-28 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 487: yeas 48, nays 2
2011-04-28 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 691: yeas 92, nays 0
2011-04-28 Rules suspended
2011-04-26 Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House
2011-04-18 House advisors appointed: T. Brown, Steuerwald and Welch
2011-04-18 House conferees appointed: Foley and L. Lawson
2011-04-18 Senator Rogers added as advisor
2011-04-18 Senator Arnold added as conferee
2011-04-18 Senator Breaux removed as advisor
2011-04-18 Senator Simpson removed as conferee
2011-04-14 Senate advisor appointed: Zakas and Breaux
2011-04-14 Senate conferee appointed: Wyss and Simpson
2011-04-14 Senate dissented from House amendments
2011-04-08 Representatives Welch and Heaton added as cosponsors
2011-04-08 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2011-04-08 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 444: yeas 86, nays 3
2011-04-07 Amendment 1 (L. Lawson), prevailed; Roll Call 414: yeas 92, nays 0
2011-04-07 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2011-04-04 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2011-02-15 Cosponsor: Rep. L. Lawson
2011-02-15 House sponsor: Rep. Foley
2011-02-15 Referred to the House
2011-02-15 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 128: yeas 49 and nays 0
2011-02-14 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-02-10 Senators Bray, Landske, Merritt and Arnold added as coauthors
2011-02-10 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-01-12 First reading: referred to Committee on Appointments and Claims
2011-01-12 Authored by Senators Wyss and Zakas

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2011&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SB&docno=0431
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/IN/IN0431.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/SB/SB0431.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/ES/ES0431.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/ES/ES0431.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/SE/SE0431.1.html
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Srollcal/0128.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Hrollcal/0414.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Hrollcal/0444.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Hrollcal/0691.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Srollcal/0487.PDF.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback