IN SB0429 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-07 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-07 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Cultural district development. Provides that an arts and cultural district (district) certified by the Indiana arts commission (commission) is subject to annual review by the commission and must be recertified every four years. Specifies certain requirements for certification (or recertification) of a district. Permits a city, town, or county that has a certified district to establish a tax area within the district to capture incremental income tax to be transferred to the Indiana arts commission trust fund and used only for the benefit of the tax area. Provides that a city, town, or county that wishes to establish a tax
Title
Cultural district development. Provides that an arts and cultural district (district) certified by the Indiana arts commission (commission) is subject to annual review by the commission and must be recertified every four years. Specifies certain requirements for certification (or recertification) of a district. Permits a city, town, or county that has a certified district to establish a tax area within the district to capture incremental income tax to be transferred to the Indiana arts commission trust fund and used only for the benefit of the tax area. Provides that a city, town, or county that wishes to establish a tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senator Alting added as coauthor |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Klinker |
2017-02-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Huston |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 235: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senators Randolph and Hershman added as coauthors |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as coauthor |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senator Niemeyer added as third author |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senator Koch added as second author |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as coauthor |
2017-01-12 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ford |