IN SB0428 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Public Law 105
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Public Law 105
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of child services. Requires the department of child services (department) to describe in a child's case plan any efforts made by the department to coordinate with school officials in developing the case plan, if efforts to coordinate with school officials are made. Requires the department to provide information to the court to be made part of the court record if the department receives information that indicates that a parent, guardian, or custodian may have violated a dispositional order.
Title
Department of child services. Requires the department of child services (department) to describe in a child's case plan any efforts made by the department to coordinate with school officials in developing the case plan, if efforts to coordinate with school officials are made. Requires the department to provide information to the court to be made part of the court record if the department receives information that indicates that a parent, guardian, or custodian may have violated a dispositional order.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Zay [R] | Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] | Sen. Erin Houchin [R] |
Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Rep. Dale DeVon [R] | Rep. Robert Heaton [R] | Rep. Julie Olthoff [R] |
Rep. Joe Taylor [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public Law 105 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 281: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2018-02-28 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2018-02-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 258: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2018-02-26 | House | Representatives Heaton, Olthoff, Taylor J added as cosponsors |
2018-02-26 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-22 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as coauthor |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as coauthor |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as third author |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senator Young M added as second author |
2018-02-05 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative DeVon |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 149: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Zay) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Zay) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Zay |