IN SB0425 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

School corporation disannexation. Establishes a two year pilot program whereby Greene Township, in St. Joseph County, may initiate a process to disannex from an existing school corporation and annex to another existing school corporation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School corporation disannexation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2020-02-05SenateReferred to the House
2020-02-04SenateCosponsors: Representatives Jordan, Clere, Deal
2020-02-04SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Cook
2020-02-04SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 189: yeas 30, nays 19
2020-02-03SenateSenator Niezgodski added as second author
2020-02-03SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-30SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-23SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2020-01-15SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2020-01-15SenateAuthored by Senator Bohacek

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback