IN SB0425 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
Pending: Senate Tax and Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Minimum age to purchase tobacco and e-liquids. With certain exceptions, raises from 18 to 21 years the age at which a person may: (1) sell or buy tobacco products or e-liquids and electronic cigarettes containing nicotine; and (2) enter designated smoking areas of a club or cigar specialty store. Allows a person who is at least 18 years of age on June 30, 2019, to continue to hold a valid tobacco retailer permit until it expires. Allows a person who is: (1) at least 18 years of age on June 30, 2019; or (2) at least 18 years of age and serving in the armed forces or reserves or a veteran discharged or separated from service in the armed forces or reserves under conditions other than dishonorable; to buy tobacco products or e-liquids and electronic cigarettes containing nicotine and enter designated smoking areas of a club or cigar specialty store. Prohibits a person who is less than 18 years of age from buying or possessing e-liquids or electronic cigarettes that do not contain nicotine. Makes changes regarding notices posted at tobacco and electronic cigarette retail establishments and at cigarette vending machines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minimum age to purchase tobacco and e-liquids. With certain exceptions, raises from 18 to 21 years the age at which a person may: (1) sell or buy tobacco products or e-liquids and electronic cigarettes containing nicotine; and (2) enter designated smoking areas of a club or cigar specialty store. Allows a person who is at least 18 years of age on June 30, 2019, to continue to hold a valid tobacco retailer permit until it expires. Allows a person who is: (1) at least 18 years of age on June 30, 2019; or (2) at least 18 years of age and serving in the armed forces or reserves or a veteran discharged or separated from service in the armed forces or reserves under conditions other than dishonorable; to buy tobacco products or e-liquids and electronic cigarettes containing nicotine and enter designated smoking areas of a club or cigar specialty store. Prohibits a person who is less than 18 years of age from buying or possessing e-liquids or electronic cigarettes that do not contain nicotine. Makes changes regarding notices posted at tobacco and electronic cigarette retail establishments and at cigarette vending machines.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07SenateCommittee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2019-01-29SenateSenator Charbonneau added as third author
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senators Head and Merritt

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback