IN SB0424 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-21 - Public Law 149
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-21 - Public Law 149
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Address confidentiality program. Allows a victim of harassment, human trafficking, intimidation, or invasion of privacy to participate in the address confidentiality program (program) of the office of the attorney general (office). (Currently the law allows only victims of domestic violence, sexual assault, or stalking to participate in the program.) Removes the requirement that a victim must have obtained a protective order to participate in the program. Requires that an applicant to the program provide a description of the applicant's plan to maintain the confidentiality of the applicant's new address. Provides, with certain exceptions, that if a program participant provides written notice to an individual, state or local government agency, business, or other legal entity: (1) the entity shall use the address designated by the office; (2) the entity may not disclose the program participant's address; and (3) if the entity is a landlord, the entity may not display the program participant's name at the protected address. Allows the office to revoke a person's participation in the program or deny an applicant's application if the person: (1) uses or intends to use the program in furtherance of a crime; (2) knowingly misrepresents in a fraudulent manner any information the program participant or applicant provides to the program; or (3) is unable or unwilling to maintain the confidentiality of the program participant's or applicant's address. Establishes the circumstances under which a program participant's address may be disclosed in a court proceeding and requires the court to issue an appropriate order to limit any further disclosure. Repeals a statute providing that a program participant who provides false information on a program application commits perjury.
Title
Address confidentiality program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-21 | Senate | Public Law 149 |
2020-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 331: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2020-02-26 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2020-02-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 215: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2020-02-24 | House | Amendment #1 (Engleman) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-02-24 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-18 | House | Representative Schaibley added as cosponsor |
2020-02-17 | House | Representative Bartlett added as cosponsor |
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-30 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Engleman |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 102: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senator Crider added as coauthor |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Rogers) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Glick added as second author |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Koch added as coauthor |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as third author |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rogers |