IN SB0424 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Public Law 36
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Privacy and tracking of rape kits. Provides that a hospital or licensed medical services provider that provides forensic medical exams and additional forensic services to a victim (provider) is entitled to reimbursement from the victim services division of the Indiana criminal justice institute (division) if the provider initiates a claim for reimbursement through the sexual assault web based claims reimbursement and tracking system. Provides that personal information: (1) concerning a sexual assault victim; and (2) entered into the division's web based claims reimbursement and sexual assault examination kit tracking system; is confidential in certain instances. Provides that notification of a forensic sample's destruction may be provided by the division through the sexual assault web based claims reimbursement and tracking system. Requires law enforcement agencies and prosecuting attorneys to cooperate with the division by providing storage updates to the division via the sexual assault web based claims reimbursement and tracking system. Allows a victim to register for notifications concerning a sexual assault examination kit through the sexual assault web based claims reimbursement and tracking system. Defines certain terms. Makes conforming amendments. Makes technical corrections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Privacy and tracking of rape kits. Provides that a hospital or licensed medical services provider that provides forensic medical exams and additional forensic services to a victim (provider) is entitled to reimbursement from the victim services division of the Indiana criminal justice institute (division) if the provider initiates a claim for reimbursement through the sexual assault web based claims reimbursement and tracking system. Provides that personal information: (1) concerning a sexual assault victim; and (2) entered into the division's web based claims reimbursement and sexual assault examination kit tracking system; is confidential in certain instances. Provides that notification of a forensic sample's destruction may be provided by the division through the sexual assault web based claims reimbursement and tracking system. Requires law enforcement agencies and prosecuting attorneys to cooperate with the division by providing storage updates to the division via the sexual assault web based claims reimbursement and tracking system. Allows a victim to register for notifications concerning a sexual assault examination kit through the sexual assault web based claims reimbursement and tracking system. Defines certain terms. Makes conforming amendments. Makes technical corrections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenatePublic Law 36
2019-04-18SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-08HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-04SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-01SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 365: yeas 46, nays 0
2019-03-27SenateMotion to concur filed
2019-03-27HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-03-26HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 355: yeas 93, nays 0
2019-03-25HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-21HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-14HouseRepresentative Jackson added as cosponsor
2019-03-12HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2019-03-12HouseRepresentative Goodrich added as cosponsor
2019-03-12HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2019-02-06SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-05SenateSenator Crane added as coauthor
2019-02-04SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-02-04SenateSenator Houchin added as coauthor
2019-02-04SenateSenator Buck added as coauthor
2019-02-04SenateCosponsor: Representative Cherry
2019-02-04SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Frye R
2019-02-04SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 68: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-01-31SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2019-01-31SenateAmendment #1 (Crider) prevailed; voice vote
2019-01-31SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-01-29SenateSenator Tomes added as coauthor
2019-01-29SenateSenator Doriot added as third author
2019-01-29SenateSenator Merritt added as second author
2019-01-28SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-15SenateCommittee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Crider

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/424/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/2/d/c/92dc4232/SB0424.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/6/4/7564a1d5/SB0424.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/f/d/1/bfd1813a/SB0424.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/9/9/da99e887/SB0424.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/d/e/a/2dea1f04/SB0424.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/c/3/6/6c3688c0/SB0424.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/e/a/82eafc06/SB0424.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/e/3/c/5e3c06e0/SB0424.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/f/d/dcfdb20f/SB0424.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/2/b/8/72b81858/SB0424.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/3/a/483a320b/SB0424.06.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/6/5/9/0659f0a5/SB0424.06.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/b/9/0/5b9064fd/SB0424.07.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/8/1/6281ade8/SB0424.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/d/7/3/2d733b34/SB0424.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/d/4/9ad4927f/SB0424.68.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/1/1/9911fc81/SB0424.04.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/f/b/56fb0930/SB0424.05.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/d/9/54d991f9/SB0424.355.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/8/6/3/586367ee/SB0424.365.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback