IN SB0423 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Court appointed youth advocate pilot program. Provides that the office of judicial administration may establish a youth advocate pilot program (pilot program) until July 1, 2021, for purposes of providing early intervention and mentoring services for children who are adjudicated delinquent. Provides that a youth advocate appointed under the pilot program is: (1) a volunteer; (2) appointed by a court to provide services for a child who is adjudicated delinquent; and (3) an officer of the court during the youth advocate's appointment. Provides that a youth advocate serves under the pilot program until: (1) the child for whom the youth advocate is appointed becomes 18 years of age; or (2) the court discharges the youth advocate; but may continue to serve in a volunteer capacity as a resource for the child thereafter. Provides that, except for gross misconduct, a youth advocate is immune from civil liability resulting from the youth advocate's performance of the youth advocate's duties: (1) in good faith; and (2) within the scope of the youth advocate's duties. Provides that information provided to a youth advocate by a child for whom the youth advocate is appointed: (1) is confidential; (2) may be disclosed only to the court that appointed the youth advocate or to the child's parent or guardian; and (3) may not be used against the child in a criminal or civil proceeding; except as required to report child abuse or neglect. Provides that the pilot program is funded through a combination of state, county, local, and private funding, with the state providing a dollar-for-dollar match of county and local funding, up to a maximum of $25,000 for any one county in any one state fiscal year, subject to availability of state funds. Provides for the reversion or return of funds upon the expiration of the pilot program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Court appointed youth advocate pilot program. Provides that the office of judicial administration may establish a youth advocate pilot program (pilot program) until July 1, 2021, for purposes of providing early intervention and mentoring services for children who are adjudicated delinquent. Provides that a youth advocate appointed under the pilot program is: (1) a volunteer; (2) appointed by a court to provide services for a child who is adjudicated delinquent; and (3) an officer of the court during the youth advocate's appointment. Provides that a youth advocate serves under the pilot program until: (1) the child for whom the youth advocate is appointed becomes 18 years of age; or (2) the court discharges the youth advocate; but may continue to serve in a volunteer capacity as a resource for the child thereafter. Provides that, except for gross misconduct, a youth advocate is immune from civil liability resulting from the youth advocate's performance of the youth advocate's duties: (1) in good faith; and (2) within the scope of the youth advocate's duties. Provides that information provided to a youth advocate by a child for whom the youth advocate is appointed: (1) is confidential; (2) may be disclosed only to the court that appointed the youth advocate or to the child's parent or guardian; and (3) may not be used against the child in a criminal or civil proceeding; except as required to report child abuse or neglect. Provides that the pilot program is funded through a combination of state, county, local, and private funding, with the state providing a dollar-for-dollar match of county and local funding, up to a maximum of $25,000 for any one county in any one state fiscal year, subject to availability of state funds. Provides for the reversion or return of funds upon the expiration of the pilot program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2019-03-14HouseRepresentative Summers added as cosponsor
2019-03-14HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-03-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
2019-02-27SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-26SenateSenator Tallian added as coauthor
2019-02-26SenateCosponsors: Representatives Steuerwald and Pressel
2019-02-26SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Cook
2019-02-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 236: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-02-25SenateSenators Ford Jon and Niemeyer added as coauthors
2019-02-25SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-02-25SenateSenator Grooms added as second author
2019-02-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-12SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-15SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Family and Children Services
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Bohacek

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/423/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/0/9/a109e07a/SB0423.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/8/4/b384a7e8/SB0423.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/f/5/f4f53004/SB0423.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/b/2/9ab23c95/SB0423.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/a/8/2/aa82df4b/SB0423.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/d/3/28d3debe/SB0423.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/6/f/b/96fb69c7/SB0423.04.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/5/6/9/9569b820/SB0423.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/d/1/9cd12b4c/SB0423.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/7/1/9a710291/SB0423.236.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/c/4/a/ec4a7e54/SB0423.03.COMS.00.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback