IN SB0423 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Public Law 265
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Sanctuary policies and postsecondary educational institutions. Prohibits a postsecondary educational institution from enacting or implementing an ordinance, a resolution, a rule, or a policy that prohibits or in any way restricts an employee of the postsecondary educational institution from taking certain actions with regard to information of the citizenship or immigration status of an individual.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sanctuary policies and postsecondary educational institutions. Prohibits a postsecondary educational institution from enacting or implementing an ordinance, a resolution, a rule, or a policy that prohibits or in any way restricts an employee of the postsecondary educational institution from taking certain actions with regard to information of the citizenship or immigration status of an individual.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Sandlin) prevailed (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02SenatePublic Law 265
2017-05-02SenateSigned by the Governor
2017-04-25SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-19HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-13SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-11SenateSenate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 454: yeas 38, nays 10
2017-04-07SenateMotion to concur filed
2017-04-05HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2017-04-04HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 380: yeas 72, nays 26
2017-03-30HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-03-27HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-03-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-01SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-28SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Burton
2017-02-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 233: yeas 35, nays 15
2017-02-27SenateSenators Freeman, Smith J, Koch added as coauthors
2017-02-27SenateAmendment #1 (Sandlin) prevailed; Roll Call 191: yeas 39, nays 10
2017-02-27SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-02-23SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-10SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2017-01-10SenateAuthored by Senators Young M and Delph

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/senate/423/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/7/2/e77211e0/SB0423.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/a/1/3/8a13f8cb/SB0423.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/0/6/7c067859/SB0423.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/b/b/3/8bb3422b/SB0423.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/d/8/0/0d805a3e/SB0423.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/5/1/13518b03/SB0423.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/9/c/369c644c/SB0423.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/f/1/52f1ad95/SB0423.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/2/e/d32e9712/SB0423.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/0/4/a2040491/SB0423.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/e/d/43ed39cc/SB0423.191.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/2/4/cd248670/SB0423.233.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/6/6/9b66f543/SB0423.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/9/7/409724e9/SB0423.380.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/4/2/4042f121/SB0423.454.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback