IN SB0422 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Court security fees and funds. Provides that a county, city, or town may adopted an ordinance to establish a local court security fee. Provides that the revenue provided to a county, city, or town from a local court security fee may be used only for local court security purposes. Provides that a redevelopment commission may provide revenue to a county, city, or town from property tax proceeds allocated to the redevelopment commission from a tax increment financing area, if the legislative body of the county, city, or town and the redevelopment commission adopt substantially similar authorizing resolutions following a joint
Title
Court security fees and funds. Provides that a county, city, or town may adopted an ordinance to establish a local court security fee. Provides that the revenue provided to a county, city, or town from a local court security fee may be used only for local court security purposes. Provides that a redevelopment commission may provide revenue to a county, city, or town from property tax proceeds allocated to the redevelopment commission from a tax increment financing area, if the legislative body of the county, city, or town and the redevelopment commission adopt substantially similar authorizing resolutions following a joint
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] | Sen. Randall Head [R] | Sen. James Arnold [D] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Rick Niemeyer [R] | Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] | Rep. Steven Davisson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Representative Davisson added as cosponsor |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Representative McNamara added as sponsor |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 173: yeas 33, nays 17 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senator Niemeyer added as coauthor |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Grooms) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Placed back on second reading |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as coauthor |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senator Head added as third author |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senator Steele added as second author |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senator Steele removed as coauthor |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Grooms) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senator Steele added as coauthor |
2015-01-12 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senator Grooms |