IN SB0419 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the law concerning the health care facility advisory council. Transfers certain duties of the council to the state department of health. Changes the amount of time from four years after birth to six months after birth that a birth certificate presented for filing is considered a delayed certificate of birth. Requires a diagnosis of autism at any age to be reported to the birth problems registry. (Current law provides for the reporting of an autism diagnosis made before a child's fifth birthday). States that the state department of health does not have to: (1) report certain information to the federal Centers for Disease Control and Prevention; (2) confirm an individual's diagnosis; or (3) provide certain verbal information; concerning an individual who is at least eight years of age and diagnosed with an autism spectrum disorder. Adds certain visual impairments to the definition of birth problems for purposes of reporting to the birth problems registry. Allows not more than 50% of the monies in the spinal cord and brain injury fund to be used to develop a statewide trauma system. Makes conforming changes.
Title
State department of health issues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 041901 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 041901 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Public Health |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Representative Frizzell added as sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 130: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-28 | Senate | SB 419 Amendment #5 (Miller, Pete), prevailed. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Senator Mishler added as third author. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: do pass amend, adopted. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Health and Provider Services |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pete Miller. |