IN SB0418 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Ballot access. Changes the number of voters required to sign a petition of nomination for a ticket for President and Vice President of the United States, the office of United States Senator, or a ticket for governor and lieutenant governor of a minor political party or an independent candidate from at least the number of voters equal to 2% of the total vote cast at the election for secretary of state to at least 4,500 voters (500 from each congressional district). Reduces from 2% to 0.5% the minimum number of votes cast at the election for secretary of state required
Title
Ballot access. Changes the number of voters required to sign a petition of nomination for a ticket for President and Vice President of the United States, the office of United States Senator, or a ticket for governor and lieutenant governor of a minor political party or an independent candidate from at least the number of voters equal to 2% of the total vote cast at the election for secretary of state to at least 4,500 voters (500 from each congressional district). Reduces from 2% to 0.5% the minimum number of votes cast at the election for secretary of state required
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | Senate | Withdrawn |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as second author |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Walker) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Walker |