IN SB0417 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Public Law 71
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Public Law 71
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Early absentee in-person voting. Provides that, whenever a county that uses electronic poll books offers early absentee in-person voting on an electronic voting system, the county may comply with the requirement that there is a procedure to ensure that an invalid ballot is not counted by: (1) requiring each voter to make and subscribe to an affidavit that includes a unique identifier; or (2) establishing a procedure to produce a document, label, or electronic record that is associated with each voter and includes a unique identifier. Requires a county to file with the election division a copy of the affidavit
Title
Early absentee in-person voting. Provides that, whenever a county that uses electronic poll books offers early absentee in-person voting on an electronic voting system, the county may comply with the requirement that there is a procedure to ensure that an invalid ballot is not counted by: (1) requiring each voter to make and subscribe to an affidavit that includes a unique identifier; or (2) establishing a procedure to produce a document, label, or electronic record that is associated with each voter and includes a unique identifier. Requires a county to file with the election division a copy of the affidavit
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Brown [R] | Rep. Milo Smith [R] | Rep. Charles Burton [R] |
Rep. Kathy Richardson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Floor - (Y: 64 N: 27 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Floor - (Y: 64 N: 27 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Public Law 71 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2017-03-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 293: yeas 93, nays 3 |
2017-03-20 | House | Amendment #1 (Hatfield) ruled out of order |
2017-03-20 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-16 | House | Representative Richardson added as cosponsor |
2017-03-16 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Burton |
2017-02-06 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Smith M |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 71: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senator Brown L added as second author |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Walker |