IN SB0416 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Public Law 104
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Hospitals and certificates of public advantage. Establishes a certificate of public advantage (certificate) pertaining to mergers between hospitals located in counties that meet certain requirements to be issued by the state department of health (state department). Provides that a hospital that has been issued a certificate may not be purchased by another hospital or system of hospitals unless the purchase has been approved by the Federal Trade Commission. Sets forth the procedure and standards for obtaining a certificate and maintaining the certificate. Requires the state department to establish fees for the application of a certificate and the monitoring of an entity holding a certificate in an amount reasonably sufficient to fully fund the costs of the review and supervision of the application. Provides that for the first five years that a hospital is operating under a certificate the hospital: (1) may not increase the charge for each individual service that the hospital offers by more than the increase in the Consumer Price Index for Medical Care; and (2) must invest the realized cost savings for the benefit of the community. Requires a hospital the has been issued a certificate to file an annual report. Allows the office of the attorney general to issue an investigative demand concerning the issuance or maintenance of a certificate. Provides for an appeal of a determination made by the state department concerning the issuance or maintenance of a certificate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospitals and certificates of public advantage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22SenatePublic Law 104
2021-04-22SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-04-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-21HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-20SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-15SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 448: yeas 42, nays 0
2021-04-14SenateMotion to concur filed
2021-04-14HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2021-04-13HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 429: yeas 94, nays 3
2021-04-12HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-04-08HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-29HouseRepresentative Heaton added as cosponsor
2021-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2021-02-24SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-23SenateCosponsor: Representative Baird
2021-02-23SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Morrison
2021-02-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 205: yeas 47, nays 0
2021-02-22SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-18SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-28SenateSenator Charbonneau added as second author
2021-01-25SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2021-01-25SenateAuthored by Senator Ford Jon

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/416/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/4/5/b54544f6/SB0416.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/8/5/6a85d72d/SB0416.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/f/2/dcf2adcb/SB0416.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/0/c/fe0c331a/SB0416.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/c/9/5ac9db64/SB0416.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/b/3/2cb32454/SB0416.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/f/c/7cfcc09d/SB0416.04.ENRH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/6/2/ea626eeb/SB0416.03.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/b/1/81b12d01/SB0416.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/e/6/e1e63e9d/SB0416.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/4/5/4845bf38/SB0416.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/3/5/683568f4/SB0416.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/7/c/a37cf613/SB0416.02.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/f/d/8/bfd84901/SB0416.02.COMS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/7/3/40730c45/SB0416.03.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/d/5/b/2d5bb405/SB0416.03.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/b/e/8/abe83219/SB0416.03.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/e/7/9/5e79fd6c/SB0416.03.COMH.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/8/0/ce80317a/SB0416.04.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/1/b/011b248c/SB0416.01.INTR.04.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/f/f/7/eff76d78/SB0416.205_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/c/1/88c12432/SB0416.02.COMS.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/b/c/52bc5f7d/SB0416.429_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/5/c/205c11c8/SB0416.448_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback