IN SB0416 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions
Pending: House Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions
Pending: House Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Consumer credit code. Urges the legislative council to assign to an interim study committee, for study during the 2018 interim, the topic of revisions to the Uniform Consumer Credit Code. Sets forth issues for consideration by an interim study committee assigned this topic.
Title
Consumer credit code. Urges the legislative council to assign to an interim study committee, for study during the 2018 interim, the topic of revisions to the Uniform Consumer Credit Code. Sets forth issues for consideration by an interim study committee assigned this topic.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-02-06 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Carbaugh |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 194: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as coauthor |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senator Eckerty added as second author |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senator Zay added as author |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senator Eckerty removed as author |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Eckerty |