IN SB0416 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Public Law 233
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Infrastructure assistance fund. Requires the Indiana finance authority to study the ability of utilities to provide clean and safe drinking water in Indiana for the foreseeable future. Requires the utility regulatory commission (IURC), in its deliberations in a general rate case of a water or wastewater utility, to consider governmental requirements arising from environmental law and their effect upon the utility's operational expenses. Authorizes the IURC, upon request by a water or wastewater utility in a general rate case, to permit the utility to voluntarily establish a customer assistance program. Provides that an IURC-approved customer assistance program may not be

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Infrastructure assistance fund. Requires the Indiana finance authority to study the ability of utilities to provide clean and safe drinking water in Indiana for the foreseeable future. Requires the utility regulatory commission (IURC), in its deliberations in a general rate case of a water or wastewater utility, to consider governmental requirements arising from environmental law and their effect upon the utility's operational expenses. Authorizes the IURC, upon request by a water or wastewater utility in a general rate case, to permit the utility to voluntarily establish a customer assistance program. Provides that an IURC-approved customer assistance program may not be

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28SenatePublic Law 233
2017-04-28SenateSigned by the Governor
2017-04-27HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-27SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-25SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-21SenateJoint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate
2017-04-21HouseJoint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House
2017-04-11SenateSenate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 453: yeas 46, nays 2
2017-04-10SenateMotion to concur filed
2017-04-07HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2017-04-06HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 417: yeas 97, nays 0
2017-04-05HouseAmendment #1 (Ober) prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-05HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-04-03HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-03-23HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2017-03-23HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-03-16HouseRepresentative Macer added as cosponsor
2017-03-09HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications
2017-02-22SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-21SenateCosponsors: Representatives Beumer and Stemler
2017-02-21SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Ober
2017-02-21SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 162: yeas 46, nays 2
2017-02-20SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2017-02-20SenateSenator Glick added as coauthor
2017-02-20SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-02-16SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2017-01-26SenateSenators Bassler, Niezgodski, Stoops added as coauthors
2017-01-26SenateSenator Tallian added as third author
2017-01-26SenateSenator Eckerty added as second author
2017-01-24SenateSenator Merritt added as coauthor
2017-01-23SenateCommittee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2017-01-10SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
2017-01-10SenateAuthored by Senator Charbonneau

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/senate/416/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/c/9/6/6c966bdf/SB0416.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/8/6/5a86939d/SB0416.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/f/9/f/ef9fdaec/SB0416.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/a/2/71a278af/SB0416.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/0/5/5405453c/SB0416.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/1/1/031187cb/SB0416.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/0/f/1b0fcef7/SB0416.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/2/8/d3284b77/SB0416.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/b/f/83bfd2b9/SB0416.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/5/f/8d5fc96c/SB0416.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/4/c/f24c5058/SB0416.06.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/3/6/0/f3609bbc/SB0416.06.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/f/1/8ff1545b/SB0416.07.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/4/3/de435158/SB0416.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/5/5/3055a650/SB0416.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/7/0/a/d70afa36/SB0416.162.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/1/7/9817dc2d/SB0416.03.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/9/5/dc955375/SB0416.04.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/3/0/5f30729a/SB0416.417.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/7/4/7d74935a/SB0416.453.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback