IN SB0415 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 191
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Department of health matters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of health matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 191
2013-05-07SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-25HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-22SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-16SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 486: yeas 48, nays 0
2013-04-03SenateMotion to concur in House amendments filed
2013-04-02HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2013-04-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 390: yeas 94, nays 0
2013-04-01HouseAmendment 1 (Porter), ruled out of order
2013-04-01HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-03-25HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-03-14HouseRepresentatives C. Brown and Macer added as cosponsors
2013-03-11HouseReassigned to Committee on Public Health
2013-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2013-02-12SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Frizzell
2013-02-12SenateReferred to the House
2013-02-12SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 114: yeas 46 and nays 3
2013-02-07SenateSenator Breaux added as coauthor
2013-02-04SenateSenator Crider added as second author
2013-02-04SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-01-31SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-01-10SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2013-01-10SenateAuthored by Senator Pat Miller

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback