IN SB0414 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 164
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 164
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Various education matters. Provides that the department of education (department) may adopt and provide to schools an early warning system that provides actionable data on students as early as elementary school. Provides that, not later than August 1, 2021, the department may contract with one or more vendors to provide an early warning system. Provides that, not later than January 1, 2022, each school corporation and charter school shall: (1) adopt and implement an Internet use policy; and (2) use hardware or install software on computers and other technology related devices owned by the school corporation or charter school to filter or block Internet access to materials that are harmful to minors. Requires each school corporation and charter school to post the Internet use policy on the school corporation's or charter school's Internet web site. Requires pupil enrollment for the career and technical education enrollment grant to, for informational purposes only, be determined at the same time that a school corporation's spring count of ADM is determined.
Title
Various education matters.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Rep. Robert Behning [R] |
Rep. Anthony Cook [R] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 66 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Harris) failed (Y: 27 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2021-03-31 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 66 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Harris) failed (Y: 27 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2021-03-31 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Public Law 164 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-04-22 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 507: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 492: yeas 42, nays 7 |
2021-04-21 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2021-04-15 | House | House advisors appointed: Jordan, Prescott, DeLaney and Klinker |
2021-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Behning and Smith V |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Koch, Yoder and Kruse |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Raatz and Qaddoura |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2021-04-14 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2021-04-13 | House | Representative Clere added as cosponsor |
2021-04-13 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 430: yeas 70, nays 25 |
2021-04-08 | House | Amendment #4 (Thompson) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-04-08 | House | Amendment #3 (Harris) failed; Roll Call 372: yeas 27, nays 62 |
2021-04-08 | House | Amendment #1 (Behning) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-04-08 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-03-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Cook |
2021-02-23 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Behning |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 204: yeas 46, nays 1 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as third author |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senator Koch added as second author |
2021-01-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Authored by Senator Raatz |