IN SB0411 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Leasing of broadband capacity infrastructure. Urges the legislative council to assign to the interim study committee on energy, utilities, and telecommunications the topic of installation and leasing of broadband capacity infrastructure by investor-owned electric utilities to broadband service providers for the provision of broadband internet service to unserved and underserved areas in Indiana. Specifies issues that must be considered in the study.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Leasing of broadband capacity infrastructure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
2020-01-29SenateReferred to the House
2020-01-28SenateSenator Crane added as coauthor
2020-01-28SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Soliday
2020-01-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 92: yeas 49, nays 0
2020-01-27SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-23SenateSenator Merritt added as second author
2020-01-23SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-16SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Utilities
2020-01-16SenateAuthored by Senator Koch

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback