IN SB0411 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that a civil action may be brought against a public or private employer that has: (1) required an applicant for employment or an employee to disclose information under certain circumstances about whether the applicant or employee owns, possesses, uses, or transports a firearm or ammunition; or (2) conditioned employment, or any rights, benefits, privileges, or opportunities offered by the employment, upon an agreement that the applicant for employment or the employee forgo the otherwise lawful ownership, possession, storage, transportation, or use of a firearm or ammunition. Provides that a governmental entity may not restrict the possession of a firearm at a person's residence during a declared emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disclosure of firearm or ammunition information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-05 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 17
2011-04-15 Signed by the Governor
2011-04-12 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-08 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-07 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-05 Returned to the Senate without amendments
2011-04-05 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 405: yeas 80, nays 17
2011-04-04 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-03-31 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2011-02-08 Cosponsors: Reps. Burton and Cheatham
2011-02-08 House sponsor: Rep. Eberhart
2011-02-08 Referred to the House
2011-02-08 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 84: yeas 38 and nays 10
2011-02-03 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-01-27 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-01-11 First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters
2011-01-11 Authored by Senators Nugent and Tomes

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback